Kesterson v. Guaranteed Rate, Inc.

Plaintiff: Danielle Kesterson
Defendant: Guaranteed Rate, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv05430
Filed: November 25, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 21, 2016 63 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 62 Stipulation filed by Guaranteed Rate, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/21/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2016)
August 1, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 43 Discovery Letter Brief requesting conference to request extension of production deadline filed by Guaranteed Rate, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/1/2016. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2016)
May 13, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 38 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Continue Mediation and Post-Mediation Status Conference filed by Guaranteed Rate, Inc. Status Report due by 8/18/2016. Status Conference set for 8/25/2016 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on May 13, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
April 4, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 34 Protective Order filed by Guaranteed Rate, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/4/2016. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2016)
March 25, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 30 (Corrected) for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint for Damages (Adding Retaliation Claim Under Cal. Labor Code Sec. 1102.5) filed by Danielle Kesterson. Docket #29 terminated. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/25/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2016)
February 19, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE INTIIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re: 21 : Case Management Statement due by 3/10/2016. Case Management Conference set for 3/17/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/19/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kesterson v. Guaranteed Rate, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Kesterson
Represented By: John A. McGuinn, Jr.
Represented By: Jeannette Vaccaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guaranteed Rate, Inc.
Represented By: Sean Francis Daley
Represented By: Laura Beth Thomasian
Represented By: Eric A. Welter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?