Valadez et al v. CSX Intermodal Terminal, Inc.

Plaintiff: Anthony Green, Jr., Miguel Valadez, Nora Ledesma, Israel Lux Carrillo, Eleaquin Temblador and Manuel Ledesma
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc. and CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv05433
Filed: November 25, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D Laporte
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2018 Filing 158 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #157 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Partial Reconsideration of the Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment [Dkt. 76] ) Defendant CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration (Doc. 157) filed byCSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc.. (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
October 26, 2018 Filing 157 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Partial Reconsideration of the Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment [Dkt. 76] filed by Israel Lux Carrillo, Anthony Green, Jr, Manuel Ledesma, Nora Ledesma, Eleaquin Temblador(on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated), Eleaquin Temblador, Miguel Valadez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Reconsideration of the Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment [DKT. 76], #2 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] Order Granting Plaintiffs' L.R. 7-9 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Partial Reconsideration of the Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgement [DKT. 76])(Gropman, Elizabeth) (Filed on 10/26/2018)
October 2, 2018 Filing 156 NOTICE by CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc. Notice of Withdrawal of Elizabeth K. Yates as Counsel for Defendant CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc. (Crow, Allison) (Filed on 10/2/2018)
September 4, 2018 Filing 155 Minute Entry for proceedings held on 9/4/2018 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte regarding the motion for reconsideration of the Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Hearing held. The Court takes the motion under submission. FTR Time: 2:13 - 2:30 Plaintiff Attorney: Aaron Kaufman Defendant Attorney: Amanda Sommerfeld (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/4/2018)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER granting Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting #153 Stipulation. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2018)
August 7, 2018 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #153 Joint Case Management Statement filed by CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc. Correct event is Stipulation & [Proposed] Order (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2018)
August 7, 2018 Filing 153 JOINT STIPULATION & [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; filed by CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc. (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 8/7/2018) Modified on 8/8/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
August 3, 2018 Filing 152 CLERK'S NOTICE: The hearing on Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Reconsideration #147 is rescheduled to 9/4/2018 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2018)
August 2, 2018 Filing 151 REPLY (re #147 Amended MOTION for Reconsideration re #135 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,,, Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,, Order on Motion to Strike,, ) filed byAnthony Green, Jr, Manuel Ledesma, Nora Ledesma, Eleaquin Temblador(on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated), Miguel Valadez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Aaron Kaufmann in Support of Reply Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6)(Gropman, Elizabeth) (Filed on 8/2/2018)
July 26, 2018 Filing 150 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #147 Amended MOTION for Reconsideration re #135 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,,, Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,, Order on Motion to Strike,, ) filed byCSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew Hiller in Support of Defendant CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration)(Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 7/26/2018)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER Re Defendant CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc.'s Request for Order Re Briefing Schedule Re Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Reconsideration signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 Filing 148 Proposed Order Defendant CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc.'s Request for Order Re Briefing Schedule Re Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Reconsideration (Dockets 145, 147) by CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re Defendant CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc.'s Request for Order Re Briefing Schedule Re Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Reconsideration (Dockets 145, 147))(Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 12, 2018 Filing 147 Amended MOTION for Reconsideration re #135 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,,, Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,, Order on Motion to Strike,, filed by Anthony Green, Jr, Manuel Ledesma, Nora Ledesma, Eleaquin Temblador(on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated), Miguel Valadez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Gropman, Elizabeth) (Filed on 7/12/2018)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' Amended Administrative Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte:granting #145 Administrative Motion. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2018)
July 9, 2018 Filing 145 Amended ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration filed by Anthony Green, Jr, Manuel Ledesma, Nora Ledesma, Eleaquin Temblador(on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated), Miguel Valadez. Responses due by 7/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kaufmann, Aaron) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
June 4, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Further Case Management Conference set for 8/14/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2018)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER on Stipulation to Continue Further Case Management Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting #143 Stipulation. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2018)
May 30, 2018 Filing 143 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Further Case Management Conference filed by Anthony Green, Jr, Manuel Ledesma, Nora Ledesma, Eleaquin Temblador(on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated), Miguel Valadez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kaufmann, Aaron) (Filed on 5/30/2018)
May 21, 2018 Filing 142 Letter from Plaintiffs' Counsel re Motion For Reconsideration . (Kaufmann, Aaron) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 141 MODIFIED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT: granting #140 Motion for Reconsideration by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
May 17, 2018 Filing 140 MOTION for Reconsideration re #135 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,,, Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,, Order on Motion to Strike,, filed by Anthony Green, Jr, Manuel Ledesma, Nora Ledesma, Eleaquin Temblador(on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated), Miguel Valadez. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kaufmann, Aaron) (Filed on 5/17/2018)
April 10, 2018 Filing 139 Minute Entry for further case management conference held on 4/10/2018 Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. A Further Case Management Conference is set for 6/19/2018 at 10:00 AM. The parties to meet and confer, then prior to the 6/19/2018 conference they shall submit a joint report that addresses the issues raised during this proceeding. FTR Time: 3:22 - 3:41 Plaintiff Attorneys: Aaron Kaufmann and Paul Cullen (telephone appearance) Defendant Attorney: Amanda Sommerfeld (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/10/2018)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER on Request for Telephonic Appearance by Paul T. Cullen at Further Case Management Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting #137 Request. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2018)
April 5, 2018 Filing 137 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Anthony Green, Jr, Manuel Ledesma, Nora Ledesma, Eleaquin Temblador(on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated), Eleaquin Temblador, Miguel Valadez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cullen, Paul) (Filed on 4/5/2018)
April 3, 2018 Filing 136 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Statement for Further Case Management Conference filed by CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc.. (Yates, Elizabeth) (Filed on 4/3/2018)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE AND DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte denying #105 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying #109 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying #111 Motion to Strike #111 MOTION to Strike or Dismiss PAGA Claim Pursuant to FRCP Rule 12, #105 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs on Employment Status, #109 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits to Declaration of Aaron Kaufmann in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Employment Status. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2018)
March 8, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 4/3/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/10/2018 03:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2018)
March 6, 2018 Filing 134 Minute Entry for proceedings held on 3/6/2018 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte regarding the motion for partial summary judgment and motion to strike. Hearing held. The Court takes the motions under submission. A case management conference is set in this matter and the related cases for 4/10/2018 at 3:00 pm. FTR Time: 9:10 - 9:43 Plaintiff Attorneys: Aaron Kaufmann, David Pogrel, and Paul Cullen Defendant Attorneys: Amanda Sommerfeld and Elizabeth Yates (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/6/2018)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER on Request for Telephonic Appearance by Paul T. Cullen signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting #132 Request. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2018)
March 2, 2018 Filing 132 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Israel Lux Carrillo, Anthony Green, Jr, Manuel Ledesma, Nora Ledesma, Eleaquin Temblador(on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated), Eleaquin Temblador. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cullen, Paul) (Filed on 3/2/2018)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER granting Joint Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference and ADR Phone Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting #126 Stipulation. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2018)
February 20, 2018 Filing 130 Declaration of Amanda C. Sommerfeld in Support of #128 Reply to Opposition/Response Amended Declaration of Amanda C. Sommerfeld filed byCSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc., CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Related document(s) #128 ) (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 2/20/2018)
February 20, 2018 Filing 129 Declaration of Amanda C. Sommerfeld in Support of #128 Reply to Opposition/Response filed byCSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc., CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Related document(s) #128 ) (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 2/20/2018)
February 20, 2018 Filing 128 REPLY (re #111 MOTION to Strike or Dismiss PAGA Claim Pursuant to FRCP Rule 12 ) filed byCSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc., CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 2/20/2018)
February 20, 2018 Filing 127 REPLY (re #105 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs on Employment Status ) filed byAnthony Green, Jr, Manuel Ledesma, Nora Ledesma, Eleaquin Temblador(on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated), Miguel Valadez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Aaron Kaufmann in Support of Reply Memorandum re Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Employment Status, #2 Declaration Declaration of Paul Cullen in Support of Reply Memorandum re Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Employment Status)(Kaufmann, Aaron) (Filed on 2/20/2018)
February 20, 2018 Filing 126 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 104 ADR Remark, 102 Clerk's Notice, Joint Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference and ADR Phone Conference and [Proposed] Order filed by CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc.. (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 2/20/2018)
February 13, 2018 Filing 125 Declaration of Joseph Krock in Support of #121 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byCSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc., CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Related document(s) #121 ) (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 2/13/2018)
February 13, 2018 Filing 124 Declaration of Fernando Jimenez in Support of #121 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byCSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc., CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Related document(s) #121 ) (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 2/13/2018)
February 13, 2018 Filing 123 Declaration of Paul Hand in Support of #121 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byCSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc., CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Related document(s) #121 ) (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 2/13/2018)
February 13, 2018 Filing 122 Declaration of Amanda Sommerfeld in Support of #121 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byCSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc., CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Related document(s) #121 ) (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 2/13/2018)
February 13, 2018 Filing 121 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #105 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs on Employment Status ) filed byCSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc., CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 2/13/2018)
February 13, 2018 Filing 120 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #111 MOTION to Strike or Dismiss PAGA Claim Pursuant to FRCP Rule 12 ) filed byAnthony Green, Jr, Manuel Ledesma, Nora Ledesma, Eleaquin Temblador(on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated), Miguel Valadez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aaron Kaufmann in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Strike or Dismiss PAGA Claim)(Kaufmann, Aaron) (Filed on 2/13/2018)
February 6, 2018 Filing 119 AMENDED #107 DECLARATION OF AMANDA C. SOMMERFELD IN SUPPORT OF CSX INTERMODAL TERMINALS, INC.'S L.R. 79-5(e) RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' ADMINSTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL; filed byCSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc., CSX Transportation, Inc. (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 2/6/2018) Modified on 2/7/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2018 Filing 118 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF CONFIDENTIALITY DESIGNATION OF EXHIBITS 8, 10-14 TO THE #107 DECLARATION OF AARON KAUFMAN ISO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON EMPLOYMENT STATUS; by CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc., CSX Transportation, Inc. (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 2/6/2018) Modified on 2/7/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
February 5, 2018 Filing 117 Declaration of Amanda Sommerfeld in Support of CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc.'s Local Rule 79-5(e) Response to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal filed byCSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc., CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 2/5/2018)
January 30, 2018 Filing 116 Declaration of Nelson Fierro in Support of #111 MOTION to Strike or Dismiss PAGA Claim Pursuant to FRCP Rule 12 filed byCSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc., CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Related document(s) #111 ) (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 30, 2018 Filing 115 Declaration of Robert Dial in Support of #111 MOTION to Strike or Dismiss PAGA Claim Pursuant to FRCP Rule 12 filed byCSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc., CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Related document(s) #111 ) (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 30, 2018 Filing 114 Declaration of Nelson Martinez in Support of #111 MOTION to Strike or Dismiss PAGA Claim Pursuant to FRCP Rule 12 filed byCSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc., CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Related document(s) #111 ) (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 30, 2018 Filing 113 Declaration of Carlos Ramirez in Support of #111 MOTION to Strike or Dismiss PAGA Claim Pursuant to FRCP Rule 12 filed byCSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc., CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Related document(s) #111 ) (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 30, 2018 Filing 112 Declaration of Amanda Sommerfeld in Support of #111 MOTION to Strike or Dismiss PAGA Claim Pursuant to FRCP Rule 12 filed byCSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc., CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Related document(s) #111 ) (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 30, 2018 Filing 111 MOTION to Strike or Dismiss PAGA Claim Pursuant to FRCP Rule 12 filed by CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc., CSX Transportation, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/6/2018 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 2/13/2018. Replies due by 2/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Strike or Dismiss PAGA Claim Pursuant to FRCP Rule 12)(Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 30, 2018 Filing 110 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Anthony Green, Jr, Manuel Ledesma, Nora Ledesma, Eleaquin Temblador(on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated), Miguel Valadez re #106 Declaration in Support, #108 Notice (Other), #107 Declaration in Support,, #105 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs on Employment Status, #109 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits to Declaration of Aaron Kaufmann in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Employment Status (Kaufmann, Aaron) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 30, 2018 Filing 109 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits to Declaration of Aaron Kaufmann in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Employment Status filed by Anthony Green, Jr, Manuel Ledesma, Nora Ledesma, Eleaquin Temblador(on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated), Miguel Valadez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 8 to A.Kaufmann Declaration, #4 Exhibit Unredacted Exhibit 8 to A.Kaufmann Declaration, #5 Exhibit Unredacted Exhibit 10 to A.Kaufmann Declaration, #6 Exhibit Unredacted Exhibit 11 to A.Kaufmann Declaration, #7 Exhibit Unredacted Exhibit 12 to A.Kaufmann Declaration, #8 Exhibit Unredacted Exhibit 13 to A.Kaufmann Declaration, #9 Exhibit Unredacted Exhibit 14 to A.Kaufmann Declaration, #10 Reference List of Redacted Information)(Kaufmann, Aaron) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 30, 2018 Filing 108 NOTICE by Anthony Green, Jr, Manuel Ledesma, Nora Ledesma, Eleaquin Temblador(on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated), Miguel Valadez re #106 Declaration in Support, #107 Declaration in Support,, #105 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs on Employment Status of Manual Filing (Kaufmann, Aaron) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 30, 2018 Filing 107 Declaration of Aaron Kaufmann in Support of #106 Declaration in Support, #105 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs on Employment Status filed byAnthony Green, Jr, Manuel Ledesma, Nora Ledesma, Eleaquin Temblador(on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated), Miguel Valadez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-10, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 11-20, #3 Exhibit Exhibits 21-29)(Related document(s) #106 , #105 ) (Kaufmann, Aaron) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 30, 2018 Filing 106 Declaration of Plaintiffs in Support of #105 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs on Employment Status filed byAnthony Green, Jr, Manuel Ledesma, Nora Ledesma, Eleaquin Temblador(on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated), Miguel Valadez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Declaration)(Related document(s) #105 ) (Kaufmann, Aaron) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 30, 2018 Filing 105 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs on Employment Status filed by Anthony Green, Jr, Manuel Ledesma, Nora Ledesma, Eleaquin Temblador(on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated), Miguel Valadez. Motion Hearing set for 3/6/2018 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 2/13/2018. Replies due by 2/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kaufmann, Aaron) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 22, 2018 Filing 104 ADR Remark: The ADR Phone Conference set for January 23, 2018, has been RESCHEDULED to February 26, 2018, at 10:30 AM Pacific time. New call-in numbers will provided to the parties. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2018) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
January 12, 2018 Filing 103 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth K. Yates for Defendant CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc (Yates, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 10, 2018 Filing 102 CLERK'S NOTICE: A Case Management Conference is set for 2/27/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. A Case Management Statement is due by 2/20/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2018)
December 9, 2017 Filing 101 Notice of Withdrawal of #97 Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related; (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 12/9/2017) Modified on 12/11/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting Stipulation to Dismiss Plaintiff Israel Lux Carrillo with Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting #99 Stipulation. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2017)
November 14, 2017 Filing 99 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Plaintiff Israel Lux Carrillo with Prejudice and [Proposed] Order filed by CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc.. (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 11/14/2017)
November 7, 2017 Filing 98 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #97 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Defendant CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related ) filed byIsrael Lux Carrillo, Anthony Green, Jr, Manuel Ledesma, Nora Ledesma, Eleaquin Temblador(on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated), Miguel Valadez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kaufmann, Aaron) (Filed on 11/7/2017)
November 3, 2017 Filing 97 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Defendant CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed by CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc.. Responses due by 11/7/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Sommerfeld Declaration, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 11/3/2017)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting Joint Stipulation to Strike Class Claims from Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting #95 Stipulation. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2017)
October 23, 2017 Filing 95 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc.. (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
September 19, 2017 Filing 94 NOTICE by Israel Lux Carrillo, Anthony Green, Jr, Manuel Ledesma, Nora Ledesma, Eleaquin Temblador(on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated), Eleaquin Temblador, Miguel Valadez of Withdrawal of Class Claims (Kaufmann, Aaron) (Filed on 9/19/2017)
July 28, 2017 Filing 93 ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on January 23, 2018, at 2:00 PM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2017) Modified on 8/17/2017 (ewh, COURT STAFF).
July 28, 2017 Filing 92 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by Tamara Lange on July 27, 2017. A further ADR Phone Conference is scheduled on January 23, 2018, at 2:00 PM Pacific time. New call-in information was provided to parties under separate cover. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2017) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
July 20, 2017 Set/Reset Hearing Motion Hearing set for 12/12/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2017)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Re: Joint Stipulation and Request to Extend Discovery and Class Certification Briefing Deadlines signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting #90 Stipulation. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2017)
June 5, 2017 Filing 90 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and Request to Extend Discovery and Class Certification Briefing Deadlines filed by CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 6/5/2017)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte denying #79 Motion for Leave to File; denying #86 Motion for Leave to File. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2017)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting #87 Application.(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2017)
May 17, 2017 Filing 87 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11401099.) filed by CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc. (Lampe, Matthew) (Filed on 5/17/2017) Modified on 5/18/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
May 15, 2017 Filing 86 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Partial Reconsideration of Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Israel Lux Carrillo, Anthony Green, Jr, Manuel Ledesma, Nora Ledesma, Eleaquin Temblador(on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated), Miguel Valadez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Motion for Reconsideration)(Gropman, Elizabeth) (Filed on 5/15/2017)
May 9, 2017 Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison Elizabeth Crow for Defendant CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc. (Crow, Allison) (Filed on 5/9/2017)
May 9, 2017 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda C. Sommerfeld for Defendant CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc. (Sommerfeld, Amanda) (Filed on 5/9/2017)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Re: Joint Stipulation and Request to Extend Defendant's Discovery Response Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting #82 Stipulation. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2017)
May 4, 2017 Filing 82 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and Request to Extend Defendant's Discovery Response Deadline filed by CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re: Joint Stipulation and Request to Extend Defendant's Discovery Response Deadline)(Allderdice, Linda) (Filed on 5/4/2017)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 RELATED CASE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte:granting #78 Motion. The court finds that case number 17-cv-2147-HSG (Briceno v. CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc.) is related to case number 15-cv-5433-EDL (Valadez, et al., v. CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2017)
April 28, 2017 Filing 80 Letter from David Pogrel . (Pogrel, David) (Filed on 4/28/2017)
April 27, 2017 Filing 79 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Partial Reconsideration of the Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant's Preemption Motion filed by CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Allderdice, Linda) (Filed on 4/27/2017)
April 27, 2017 Filing 78 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed by CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc.. Responses due by 5/1/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Administrative Motion, #2 Exhibit B to Administrative Motion, #3 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion)(Allderdice, Linda) (Filed on 4/27/2017)
April 11, 2017 Filing 77 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on March 7, 2017 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte by Israel Lux Carrillo, Anthony Green, Jr, Manuel Ledesma, Nora Ledesma, Eleaquin Temblador(on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated), Eleaquin Temblador, Miguel Valadez, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Gropman, Elizabeth) (Filed on 4/11/2017)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part Defendant's Preemption Motion by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting in part and denying in part #65 Motion. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2017)
April 3, 2017 Filing 75 AUDIO RECORDINGS ORDER (re: 71 Motion Hearing, ), by CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc.. Court will send to John H. Haney at john.haney@hklaw.com a link to the files requested in this order. ( Filing fee $ 31, receipt number 0971-11283948). (Haney, John) (Filed on 4/3/2017) Modified on 4/4/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). This is a Text Only Docket Entry
March 22, 2017 Filing 74 NOTICE by CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc. Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings (Allderdice, Linda) (Filed on 3/22/2017)
March 10, 2017 Filing 73 Supplemental Brief re #65 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication of Issues on the Defense of Federal Preemption; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byIsrael Lux Carrillo, Anthony Green, Jr, Manuel Ledesma, Nora Ledesma, Eleaquin Temblador(on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated), Eleaquin Temblador, Miguel Valadez. (Related document(s) #65 ) (Gropman, Elizabeth) (Filed on 3/10/2017)
March 10, 2017 Filing 72 Supplemental Brief re #65 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication of Issues on the Defense of Federal Preemption; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byCSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc.. (Related document(s) #65 ) (Allderdice, Linda) (Filed on 3/10/2017)
March 7, 2017 Filing 71 Minute Entry for proceedings held on 3/7/2017 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte regarding the motion for summary judgment #65 . Discussion held. Counsel shall submit further briefing of no more than 5 pages on or before 3/10/2017. FTR Time 9:16 - 9:40 Plaintiff Attorneys: Aaron Kaufmann, Elizabeth Gropman, and Paul Cullen Defendant Attorneys: Linda Allderdice and John Haney This is a text only Minute Entry (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/7/2017) Modified on 4/11/2017: Matter transcribed by Victoria Valine. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
February 21, 2017 Filing 70 REPLY (re #65 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication of Issues on the Defense of Federal Preemption; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) filed byCSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc.. (Allderdice, Linda) (Filed on 2/21/2017)
January 27, 2017 Filing 69 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #65 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication of Issues on the Defense of Federal Preemption; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) filed byIsrael Lux Carrillo, Anthony Green, Jr, Manuel Ledesma, Nora Ledesma, Eleaquin Temblador(on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated), Eleaquin Temblador, Miguel Valadez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Aaron Kaufmann in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Declaration Declaration of Marty Frates in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Declaration Declaration of Plaintiff Anthony Green, Sr. in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Declaration Declaration of Plaintiff Miguel Valadez in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, #5 Declaration Declaration of Plaintiff Nora Ledesma in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, #6 Declaration Declaration of Plaintiff Manuel Ledesma in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, #7 Declaration Declaration of Plaintiff Eleaquin Temblador in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment)(Gropman, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/27/2017)
January 24, 2017 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth R Gropman (Gropman, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/24/2017)
January 16, 2017 Filing 67 ANSWER to #61 Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint byCSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc.. (Allderdice, Linda) (Filed on 1/16/2017) Modified on 1/17/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
December 27, 2016 Filing 66 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge; by Eleaquin Temblador, Eleaquin Temblador. (Kaufmann, Aaron) (Filed on 12/27/2016) Modified on 12/28/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
December 22, 2016 Filing 65 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication of Issues on the Defense of Federal Preemption; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/7/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 1/27/2017. Replies due by 2/21/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Linda Auerbach Allderdice in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit A of Linda Auerbach Allderdice Declaration, #3 Exhibit B of Linda Auerbach Allderdice Declaration, #4 Declaration of Paul Hand in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #5 Exhibit A of Paul Hand Declaration, #6 Exhibit B of Paul Hand Declaration, #7 Exhibit C of Paul Hand Declaration, #8 Exhibit D of Paul Hand Declaration, #9 Exhibit E of Paul Hand Declaration, #10 Exhibit F of Paul Hand Declaration, #11 Exhibit G of Paul Hand Declaration, #12 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Summary Judgement)(Allderdice, Linda) (Filed on 12/22/2016)
December 21, 2016 Filing 64 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination. Plaintiff Eleaquin Temblador shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 12/28/2016. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2016)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Re Joint Stipulation for Continued Briefing Schedule and hearing Date on Defendant's Preemption Motion signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting #62 Stipulation. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2016)
December 20, 2016 Filing 62 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation for Continued Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date on Defendant's Preemption Motion filed by CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re: Joint Stipulation for Continued Briefing)(Allderdice, Linda) (Filed on 12/20/2016)
December 20, 2016 Filing 61 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOURTH AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR: 1) REIMBURSEMENT OF BUSINESS EXPENSES (LABOR CODE 2802); 2) UNLAWFUL DEDUCTIONS FROM WAGES (LABOR CODE 221 AND IWC WAGE ORDER NO. 9); 3) FAILURE TO PROVIDE OFF-DUTY MEAL PERIODS (LABOR CODE 226.7, 512, IWC WAGE ORDER NO. 9); 4) FAILURE TO PROVIDE OFF-DUTY PAID REST PERIODS (LABOR CODE 226.7, IWC WAGE ORDER NO. 9); 5) MINIMUM WAGE (LABOR CODE 1182.11, 1194, ET SEQ., IWC WAGE ORDER NO. 9, MINIMUM WAGE ORDER); 6) FAILURE TO TIMELY PROVIDE CODE-COMPLAINT WAGE STATEMENTS; 7) VIOLATIONS OF THE UNFAIR COMPETITION LAW (UCL) (BUSINESS & PROFESSIONS CODE 17200-09); and 8) PRIVATE ATTORNEY GENERAL ACT PENALTIES (LABOR CODE 2699) DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc.. Filed byAnthony Green, Jr, Miguel Valadez, Nora Ledesma, Manuel Ledesma, Israel Lux Carrillo. (Kaufmann, Aaron) (Filed on 12/20/2016)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER on Stipulation for Leave to File a Fourth Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting #58 Stipulation. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2016)
December 16, 2016 Filing 59 Declaration of Paul T. Cullen in Support of #58 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR LEAVE TO FILE FOURTH AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed byIsrael Lux Carrillo, Anthony Green, Jr, Manuel Ledesma, Nora Ledesma, Miguel Valadez. (Related document(s) #58 ) (Cullen, Paul) (Filed on 12/16/2016)
December 16, 2016 Filing 58 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR LEAVE TO FILE FOURTH AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by Israel Lux Carrillo, Anthony Green, Jr, Manuel Ledesma, Nora Ledesma, Miguel Valadez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cullen, Paul) (Filed on 12/16/2016)
December 9, 2016 Filing 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication of Issues on the Defense of Federal Preemption; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/28/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 1/20/2017. Replies due by 2/14/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Linda Auerbach Allderdice, #2 Exhibit A to Linda Auerbach Allderdice Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Linda Auerbach Allderdice, #4 Declaration of Paul Hand, #5 Exhibit A to Paul Hand Declaration, #6 Exhibit B to Paul Hand Declaration, #7 Exhibit C to Paul Hand Declaration, #8 Exhibit D to Paul Hand Declaration, #9 Exhibit E to Paul Hand Declaration, #10 Exhibit F to Paul Hand Declaration, #11 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Summary Judgment)(Allderdice, Linda) (Filed on 12/9/2016)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER for Standard Litigation signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting #55 Stipulation. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2016)
December 1, 2016 Filing 55 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR STANDARD LITIGATION filed by CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc.. (Allderdice, Linda) (Filed on 12/1/2016)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Re: Schedule for Class Certification Motion and Related Discovery signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte.(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2016)
October 28, 2016 Filing 53 Proposed Order re #52 Statement Schedule for Class Certification Motion and Related Discovery by CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc.. (Allderdice, Linda) (Filed on 10/28/2016)
October 27, 2016 Filing 52 Statement Joint Statement Regarding Schedule for Class Certification Motion and Related Discovery by CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc.. (Allderdice, Linda) (Filed on 10/27/2016)
October 22, 2016 Set/Reset Hearing Motion Hearing set for 2/28/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2016)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 RELATED CASE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting granting #46 Administrative Motion. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2016)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2016)
October 6, 2016 Filing 49 STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT by CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc.. (Allderdice, Linda) (Filed on 10/6/2016)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Granting Brief Continuance for Filing Joint Status Update signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting #47 Stipulation. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
October 4, 2016 Filing 47 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation for Brief Continuance to Submit Proposed Status Update filed by CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Brief Continuance for Filing Joint Status Update)(Allderdice, Linda) (Filed on 10/4/2016)
October 4, 2016 Filing 46 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases should be Related filed by CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc.. Responses due by 10/11/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related)(Allderdice, Linda) (Filed on 10/4/2016)
September 27, 2016 Filing 45 Minute Entry for further case management conference held on 9/27/2016 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. On April 22, 2016, the Court approved the parties stipulated request to stay proceedings pending the parties participation in private mediation. In a joint status report filed on September 21, 2016 and during the Case Management Conference on September 27, 2016, the parties informed the Court that the mediation had been unsuccessful and requested that the Court lift the stay. Good cause appearing, the Court lifts the stay of litigation in this matter as of September 27, 2016. As discussed during the Case Management Conference, the parties shall file a status update with proposed deadlines by October 4, 2016. FTR Time: 10:09 - 10:23 Plaintiff Attorneys: Aaron Kaufman and Paul Cullen (telephonic appearance)Defendant Attorney: Linda Allderdice This is a text only Minute Entry (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/27/2016)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER on Request for Telephonic Appearance by Paul T. Cullen at Joint Case Management Statement signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting #43 Request. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2016)
September 26, 2016 Filing 43 First MOTION to Appear by Telephone at September 27, 2016 Status Conference filed by Manuel Ledesma, Nora Ledesma. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cullen, Paul) (Filed on 9/26/2016)
September 21, 2016 Filing 42 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FURTHER JOINT STATUS REPORT RE ADR & CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENTT filed by Israel Lux Carrillo, Anthony Green, Jr, Manuel Ledesma, Nora Ledesma, Miguel Valadez. (Kaufmann, Aaron) (Filed on 9/21/2016)
August 25, 2016 Filing 41 NOTICE by CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc. of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Allderdice, Linda) (Filed on 8/25/2016)
July 25, 2016 Filing 40 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Linda Auerbach Allderdice (Allderdice, Linda) (Filed on 7/25/2016)
July 25, 2016 Filing 39 STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT RE ADR by Israel Lux Carrillo, Anthony Green, Jr, Manuel Ledesma, Nora Ledesma, Miguel Valadez. (Kaufmann, Aaron) (Filed on 7/25/2016)
April 22, 2016 Set/Reset Hearing Further Case Management Conference continued to 9/27/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2016)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Approving Stipulation Regarding ADR and Stay of Proceedings signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting #37 Stipulation. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2016)
April 21, 2016 Filing 37 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re ADR and Stay of Proceedings; Declaration of Linda Auerbach Allderdice in Support Thereof filed by CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Approving Stipulation Re ADR and Stay of Proceedings)(Allderdice, Linda) (Filed on 4/21/2016)
April 12, 2016 Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Strike, the Second Cause of Action; Dismiss the Third and Fourth Cause of Action; Dismiss or, Alternatively Stay the Seventh Cause of Action and Strike Portions of the Third Amended Complaint filed by CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/24/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 4/26/2016. Replies due by 5/3/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Linda Auerbach Allderdice, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Allderdice, Linda) (Filed on 4/12/2016)
March 22, 2016 Filing 35 THIRD AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR: 1) REIMBURSEMENT OF BUSINESS EXPENSES (LABOR CODE 2802); 2) UNLAWFUL DEDUCTIONS FROM WAGES (LABOR CODE 221 AND IWC WAGE ORDER NO.9); 3) FAILURE TO PROVIDE OFF-DUTY MEAL PERIODS (LABOR CODE 226.7, 512, IWC WAGE ORDER NO.9); 4) FAILURE TO PROVIDE OFF-DUTY PAID REST PERIODS (LABOR CODE 226.7, IWC WAGE ORDER NO.9); 5) MINIMUM WAGE (LABOR CODE 1182.1. 11, 1194, ET SEQ; IWC WAGE ORDER NO.9, MINIMUM WAGE ORDER); 6) VIOLATIONS OF THE UNFAIR COMPETITION LAW (UCL)(BUSINESS & PROFESSIONS CODE 17200-09); 7) PRIVATE ATTORNEY GENERAL ACT PENALTIES (LABOR CODE 2699); DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; against CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc. Filed byMiguel Valadez, Nora Ledesma, Manuel Ledesma, Israel Lux Carrillo, Anthony Green, Jr.; Re 340 Order (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2016)
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting Leave to File Third Amended Class Action Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting #33 Stipulation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3rd Amended Complaint)(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2016)
March 21, 2016 Filing 33 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by Israel Lux Carrillo, Manuel Ledesma, Nora Ledesma, Miguel Valadez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT)(Kaufmann, Aaron) (Filed on 3/21/2016)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2016)
March 15, 2016 Filing 31 Minute Entry for case management conference held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 3/15/2016. (FTR Time 10:07 - 10:27) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/15/2016)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting Request for Telephonic Appearance signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting #29 Request..(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2016)
March 14, 2016 Filing 29 MOTION to Appear by Telephone for March 15, 2016 Case Management Conference filed by Manuel Ledesma, Nora Ledesma. (Cullen, Paul) (Filed on 3/14/2016)
March 8, 2016 Filing 28 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT First Amended Complaint: January 29, 2016 filed by CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc.. (Allderdice, Linda) (Filed on 3/8/2016)
March 7, 2016 Filing 27 SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR: 1) REIMBURSEMENT OF BUSINESS EXPENSES (LABOR CODE 2802); 2) UNLAWFUL DEDUCTIONS FROM WAGES (LABOR CODE 221 AND IWC WAGE ORDER NO.9); 3) FAILURE TO PROVIDE OFF-DUTY MEAL PERIODS (LABOR CODE 226.7, 512, IWC WAGE ORDER NO.9); 4) FAILURE TO PROVIDE OFF-DUTY PAID REST PERIODS (LABOR CODE 226.7, IWC WAGE ORDER NO.9); 5) MINIMUM WAGE (LABOR CODE 1182.00, 1194, ET SEQ., IWC WAGE ORDER NO.9, MINIMUM WAGE ORDER); 60 VIOLATIONS OF THE UNFAIR COMPETITION LAW (UCL) (BUSINESS & PROFESSIONS CODE 17200-09); DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; against CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc. Filed byMiguel Valadez, Nora Ledesma, Manuel Ledesma, Israel Lux Carrillo. Re #26 Order & Per Chambers (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2016)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting Leave to File Second Amended Class Action Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting #25 Stipulation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Second Amended Complaint)(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2016) Modified on 3/10/2016 (shyS, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2016 Filing 25 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by Israel Lux Carrillo, Manuel Ledesma, Nora Ledesma, Miguel Valadez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Second Amended Complaint- Final, #2 Exhibit B. Second Amended Complaint- REDLINE)(Kaufmann, Aaron) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
February 18, 2016 Filing 24 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Allderdice, Linda) (Filed on 2/18/2016)
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Extending Dates Set Forth in Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference and ADR Deadlines signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting #20 Stipulation. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2016)
February 10, 2016 Filing 22 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options for Nora Ledesma (Cullen, Paul) (Filed on 2/10/2016)
February 10, 2016 Filing 21 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options for Manuel Ledesma (Cullen, Paul) (Filed on 2/10/2016)
February 10, 2016 Filing 20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Dates Set Forth In Order Setting Initial CMC and ADR Deadlines; Declaration of Linda Auerbach Allderdice in Support Thereof filed by CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Extending Dates Set Forth in Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference and ADR Deadlines)(Allderdice, Linda) (Filed on 2/10/2016)
February 8, 2016 Filing 19 NOTICE by CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc., CSX Transportation, Inc. of Taking Off Calendar Motions Pursuant, Respectively, To Rule 12(b)(2) and Rule 12(b)(6) (Allderdice, Linda) (Filed on 2/8/2016)
February 5, 2016 Filing 18 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Israel Lux Carrillo (Kaufmann, Aaron) (Filed on 2/5/2016)
February 5, 2016 Filing 17 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Miguel Valadez (Kaufmann, Aaron) (Filed on 2/5/2016)
January 29, 2016 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc., CSX Transportation, Inc.. Filed byMiguel Valadez, Israel Lux Carrillo. (Kaufmann, Aaron) (Filed on 1/29/2016)
January 27, 2016 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE: The Case Management Conference is rescheduled to 2/23/2016 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2016)
January 15, 2016 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Sixth, Seventh and Eighth Causes of Action filed by CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc., CSX Transportation, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/23/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 1/29/2016. Replies due by 2/5/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Sixth, Seventh and Eighth Causes)(Allderdice, Linda) (Filed on 1/15/2016)
January 15, 2016 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc., CSX Transportation, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/23/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 1/29/2016. Replies due by 2/5/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Paul R. Hitchcock, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction)(Allderdice, Linda) (Filed on 1/15/2016)
December 8, 2015 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Israel Lux Carrillo, Miguel Valadez.. (Kaufmann, Aaron) (Filed on 12/8/2015)
December 7, 2015 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc., CSX Transportation, Inc... (Allderdice, Linda) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
December 1, 2015 Filing 10 NOTICE by CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc., CSX Transportation, Inc. of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. Section 1446(d); and Service of Standing Orders of Magistrate Judge (Allderdice, Linda) (Filed on 12/1/2015)
December 1, 2015 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Extend the Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc., CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Allderdice, Linda) (Filed on 12/1/2015)
November 30, 2015 Filing 8 NOTICE by CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc., CSX Transportation, Inc. of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings (Allderdice, Linda) (Filed on 11/30/2015)
November 25, 2015 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/16/2016. Case Management Conference set for 2/23/2016 10:00 AM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2015)
November 25, 2015 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (srn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2015)
November 25, 2015 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by CSX Transportation, Inc. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Allderdice, Linda) (Filed on 11/25/2015) Modified on 11/25/2015 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
November 25, 2015 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons, identifying Corporate Parent CSX Corporation for CSXIT, filed byCSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc., CSX Transportation, Inc. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Allderdice, Linda) (Filed on 11/25/2015) Modified on 11/25/2015 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
November 25, 2015 Filing 3 Declaration of Robert L. Grant in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, of Civil Action to Federal Court filed byCSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc., CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Allderdice, Linda) (Filed on 11/25/2015)
November 25, 2015 Filing 2 Declaration of Joann Wallace in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, of Civil Action to Federal Court filed byCSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc., CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Allderdice, Linda) (Filed on 11/25/2015)
November 25, 2015 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Civil Action to Federal Court from Alameda Superior Court. Their case number is RG15787834. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-10023137). Filed byCSX Transportation, Inc., CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal - Complaint , #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet)(Allderdice, Linda) (Filed on 11/25/2015) Modified on 11/25/2015 (mclS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valadez et al v. CSX Intermodal Terminal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Green, Jr.
Represented By: Paul Thomas Cullen
Represented By: Elizabeth R Gropman
Represented By: Aaron D. Kaufmann
Represented By: David Philip Pogrel
Represented By: Giselle Olmedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Valadez
Represented By: Paul Thomas Cullen
Represented By: Elizabeth R Gropman
Represented By: Aaron D. Kaufmann
Represented By: David Philip Pogrel
Represented By: Giselle Olmedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nora Ledesma
Represented By: Paul Thomas Cullen
Represented By: Elizabeth R Gropman
Represented By: Aaron D. Kaufmann
Represented By: David Philip Pogrel
Represented By: Giselle Olmedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Israel Lux Carrillo
Represented By: Paul Thomas Cullen
Represented By: Elizabeth R Gropman
Represented By: Aaron D. Kaufmann
Represented By: David Philip Pogrel
Represented By: Giselle Olmedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eleaquin Temblador
Represented By: Aaron D. Kaufmann
Represented By: Paul Thomas Cullen
Represented By: Elizabeth R Gropman
Represented By: David Philip Pogrel
Represented By: Giselle Olmedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Ledesma
Represented By: Paul Thomas Cullen
Represented By: Elizabeth R Gropman
Represented By: Aaron D. Kaufmann
Represented By: David Philip Pogrel
Represented By: Giselle Olmedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: John H Haney
Represented By: Linda Auerbach Allderdice
Represented By: Amanda C. Sommerfeld
Represented By: James Walter Michalski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc.
Represented By: Allison Elizabeth Crow
Represented By: John H Haney
Represented By: Linda Auerbach Allderdice
Represented By: Matthew W Lampe
Represented By: Amanda C. Sommerfeld
Represented By: Elizabeth K. Yates
Represented By: James Walter Michalski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?