Luna et al v. Marvell Technology Group, Ltd. et al

Plaintiff: Daniel Luna
Defendant: Marvell Technology Group LTD, Sehat Sutardja, Michael Sashkin and Sukhi Nagesh
Consol_plaintiff: Philip Limbacher and Jim Farno
Movant: Philip J Limbacher, Employees Pension Plan Of The City Of Clearwater, Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Cambridge Retirement System, Oakland County Employees' Retirement System and Hui Qian
Case Number: 3:2015cv05447
Filed: November 27, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:0078j
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 9, 2017 209 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE MOTION TO SEAL by Judge William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 187 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2017)
December 8, 2017 207 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE MOTION TO SEAL by Judge William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 179 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
October 27, 2017 202 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Judge William Alsup re 160 Motion to Certify Class.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2017)
September 22, 2017 193 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS by Hon. William Alsup in case 5:15-cv-04881-RMW; granting (169) Motion to Compel in case 3:15-cv-05447-WHA.Associated Cases: 3:15-cv-05447-WHA, 5:15-cv-04881-RMW(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 12, 2017 184 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE PRIVILEGE LOG STIPULATION Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/12/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2017)
August 7, 2017 165 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING JOINT AND UNOPPOSED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Hon. William Alsup granting 164 Administrative Motion.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2017)
August 3, 2017 163 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING ENLARGED BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND PAGE LIMITS FOR MOTION TO CERTIFY CLASS re 161 Stipulation filed by Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/3/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2017)
June 19, 2017 156 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. William Alsup granting 153 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2017)
May 17, 2017 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS AMENDED CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT by Judge Alsup granting 113 Motion to Dismiss; denying 114 Motion to Dismiss; granting 115 Motion to Dismiss; denying 116 Motion to Dismiss Further Case Management Conference set for 6/1/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2017)
May 3, 2017 134 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE ORAL ARGUMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/3/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2017)
March 6, 2017 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING D. SCOTT CARLTON'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT MICHAEL RASHKIN by Hon. William Alsup granting 124 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney..(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2017)
January 17, 2017 112 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER Jury Selection set for 3/5/2018 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Jury Trial set for 3/5/2018 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/17/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
November 28, 2016 105 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE REGARDING FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/28/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2016)
October 12, 2016 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte granting defendants' Motions to Dismiss 68 , 70 , 71 , 72 , with leave to amend. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2016)
February 8, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte granting 33 , 45 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2016)
January 11, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER non acceptance of proposal re 48 Stipulation Continuing Initial Case Management Conference and setting dates for filing of a Consolidated Complaint and responses thereto, filed by Marvell Technology Group LTD. The Court finds the pro posed dates too far in the future and therefor, has not accepted the proposal. The court would sign a stipulation that sets a case management schedule ending with a date in June or July 2016. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/7/2016. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2016)
December 22, 2015 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 19 Defendant Marvell Technology Group, Ltd.'s (5:15-cv-04881-RMW)Motion to Relate Cases. It is ordered that the case 5:15-cv-04881-RMW is deemed related to the cases (consolidated) under the case 3:15-cv-05447-JST captioned L una, et al., v. Marvell Technology Group, Ltd., et al., pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12. Case No. 3:15-cv-05447-JST, and (consolidated) cases shall be reassigned to the Hon. Ronald M. Whyte for all purposes. The Clerk is to notify the parties and affected judge once the above-mentioned case is formally reassigned to Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 12/21/2015. (amk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2015)
December 1, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADVANCING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 1/6/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/13/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 1, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luna et al v. Marvell Technology Group, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Luna
Represented By: Lionel Zevi Glancy
Represented By: Lesley Frank Portnoy
Represented By: Robert Vincent Prongay
Represented By: Casey Edwards Sadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvell Technology Group LTD
Represented By: Jason Frank Lake
Represented By: Harry Arthur Olivar, Jr.
Represented By: Valerie Suzanne Roddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sehat Sutardja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Sashkin
Represented By: Joshua Garrett Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sukhi Nagesh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_plaintiff: Philip Limbacher
Represented By: Patrick V. Dahlstrom
Represented By: Joseph Alexander Hood, II
Represented By: Jeremy Alan Lieberman
Represented By: Jennifer Pafiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_plaintiff: Jim Farno
Represented By: Patrick V. Dahlstrom
Represented By: Joseph Alexander Hood, II
Represented By: Jeremy Alan Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Philip J Limbacher
Represented By: Patrick V. Dahlstrom
Represented By: Joseph Alexander Hood, II
Represented By: Jeremy Alan Lieberman
Represented By: Jennifer Pafiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Employees Pension Plan Of The City Of Clearwater
Represented By: Curtis Victor Trinko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund
Represented By: Matthew Isaac Alpert
Represented By: David Avi Rosenfeld
Represented By: Scott H. Saham
Represented By: Shawn A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Cambridge Retirement System
Represented By: Avi Josefson
Represented By: Gerald H. Silk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Oakland County Employees' Retirement System
Represented By: Avi Josefson
Represented By: Gerald H. Silk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Hui Qian
Represented By: Lesley Frank Portnoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?