Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company v. Kraus USA, Incorporated

Plaintiff: Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company
Defendant: Kraus USA, Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2015cv05514
Filed: December 2, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 14, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 11/14/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2016)
May 31, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/30/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/7/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/31/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2016)
April 1, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/1/2016. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2016)
March 10, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/10/2016. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2016)
March 4, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER.Pretrial Conference set for 1/26/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Jury Selection set for 2/6/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisc o before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Jury Trial set for 2/6/2017 to 2/17/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 3/4/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
January 12, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part and denying in part 6 Motion to Strike (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company v. Kraus USA, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company
Represented By: Timothy Steven Brown
Represented By: Clarence Edwin Witt, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kraus USA, Incorporated
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Gille
Represented By: Kenyon M. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?