Kathleen Marchetti v. State of California Department of Motor Vehicles et al

Plaintiff: Kathleen Marchetti
Defendant: State of California Department of Motor Vehicles, Superior Court of California, Clerk of the Superior Court of California, The California Judicial Council, Tim Lnu, Jeannette Lnu and Alliance One
Case Number: 3:2015cv05523
Filed: December 2, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 7, 2016 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/07/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2016)
August 3, 2016 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 62 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for extension of time. Replies due by 8/8/2016. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/03/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2016)
April 29, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO CONTINUE THE HEARING ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FROM MAY 4, 2016, TO MAY 11, 2016 granting 45 STIPULATION. Case Management Conference and hearing as to 25 , 28 , 34 MOTION to Dismiss reset for 5/11/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/29/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2016)
February 18, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William H. Orrick. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/18/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kathleen Marchetti v. State of California Department of Motor Vehicles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Marchetti
Represented By: Lawrence Dale Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California Department of Motor Vehicles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Court of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clerk of the Superior Court of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The California Judicial Council
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Lnu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeannette Lnu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliance One
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?