Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for AmTrust Bank v. RPM Mortgage, Inc.

Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for AmTrust Bank
Defendant: RPM Mortgage, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv05534
Filed: December 3, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 17, 2017 78 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 76 Dismissing Third Party Defendant Jaclynn Coates (ONLY) with Prejudice filed by RPM Mortgage, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/17/17. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 21, 2016 56 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 54 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Answer for Third Party Jaclynn Coates filed by Jaclynn Coates. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/21/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2016)
October 27, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 47 to Modify Case Management Order filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for AmTrust Bank. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/27/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2016)
September 30, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 36 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Protective Order filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for AmTrust Bank. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/30/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
March 14, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re: 22 : Case Management Conference continued from 3/17/2016 to 4/7/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 3/31/2016. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/14/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2016)
March 2, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 15 Stipulation to file amended answer filed by RPM Mortgage, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/2/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2016)
January 5, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Edward M. Chen. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/5/16. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for AmTrust Bank v. RPM Mortgage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for AmTrust Bank
Represented By: Dana Jean Clausen
Represented By: Paul Andrew Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RPM Mortgage, Inc.
Represented By: David Evan Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?