9Global Inc v. Avant Credit Corporation

Plaintiff: 9Global Inc
Defendant: Avant Credit Corporation
Case Number: 3:2015cv05543
Filed: December 3, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 22, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 17 MOTION TO DISMISS AND DENYING 24 MOTION FOR SANCTIONS. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2016)
April 1, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/1/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2016)
March 23, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 27 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/17/16. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 9Global Inc v. Avant Credit Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 9Global Inc
Represented By: Peter Reza Afrasiabi
Represented By: Joanna Ardalan
Represented By: Christopher W Arledge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avant Credit Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?