Perez v. San Miguel Homes for the Elderly, LLC et al

Plaintiff: THOMAS E. PEREZ, Secretary of Labor
Defendant: San Miguel Homes for the Elderly, LLC, Precilla San Miguel, Teofilo Cris Sanque and Ryan San Miguel
Case Number: 3:2015cv05556
Filed: December 4, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 17, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT JUDGMENT in favor of THOMAS E. PEREZ, Secretary of Labor against Precilla San Miguel, Ryan San Miguel, Teofilo Cris Sanque, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 05/17/2016. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2016)
May 12, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 38 Amended MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Burton Employment Law filed by Ryan San Miguel, Teofilo Cris Sanque, San Miguel Homes for the Elderly, LLC, Precilla San Miguel. Supplemental brief due 05/19/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 05/12/2016. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2016)
April 25, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TAKING STATUS CONFERENCE OFF CALENDAR. The status conference previously ordered for Tuesday, April 26, 2016 is off calendar. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 4/25/2016. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2016)
April 22, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO APPEAR AT STATUS CONFERENCE. Status Conference set for 4/26/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 4/22/2016. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2016)
February 16, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting in part and denying in part 18 Motion to Shorten Time.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2016)
February 9, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying without prejudice 15 Motion for TRO.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. San Miguel Homes for the Elderly, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Miguel Homes for the Elderly, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Precilla San Miguel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teofilo Cris Sanque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan San Miguel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS E. PEREZ, Secretary of Labor
Represented By: Tara E. Stearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?