Julie Davenport v. Gracenote, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Julie Davenport
Defendant: Gracenote, Inc. and Tribune Company
Case Number: 3:2015cv05573
Filed: December 4, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 29, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Requesting Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/29/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2016)
August 5, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 9/8/2016 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 9/1/2016. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/5/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2016)
March 24, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/24/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2016)
March 10, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/13/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Pretrial Conference set for 3/9/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Jury Selection/Trial set for 4/3/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/10/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2016)
March 8, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 20 TO ALLOW DEFENDANTS TO FILE FIRST AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/8/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2016)
February 4, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Richard Seeborg. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/4/16. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Julie Davenport v. Gracenote, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Davenport
Represented By: Rory Cosby Quintana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gracenote, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tribune Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?