LESA, LLC v. Family Trust of Kimberley and Alfred Mandel et al

Plaintiff: LESA, LLC
Defendant: Family Trust of Kimberley and Alfred Mandel, Richard Taylor, James Fisher, Christine Williams and 2000 Jackson Family Trust
Case Number: 3:2015cv05574
Filed: December 4, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 28, 2017 70 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 69 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Gregory Rossmann, Christine Williams, LESA, LLC, Andrew Chase, James Fisher, Andrew Chase 2005 Revocable Trust UAD 3/29/05 as amended 5/10/20, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 2/28/17. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2017)
November 8, 2016 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting in part and denying in part 33 Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2016)
August 25, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 54 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER ENLARGING TIME RE: HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. filed by Gregory Rossmann, Christine Williams, L ESA, LLC, Andrew Chase, Alfred Mandel, James Fisher, Andrew Chase 2005 Revocable Trust UAD 3/29/05 as amended 5/10/20, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 54 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER ENLARGING TIME RE: HEAR ING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT., 33 Second MOTION to Dismiss and for Partial Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 11/3/2016 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore.. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 8/25/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2016)
April 13, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting in part and denying in part 13 Motion to Dismiss. Amended complaint due within 14 days.(kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2016)
April 1, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS JACKSON AND TAYLOR re 19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE filed by LESA, LLC, 2000 Jackson Family Trust and Richard Taylor terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 4/1/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2016)
January 11, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (AS MODIFIED) 9 GRANTING STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Motion Hearing set for 2/18/2016 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 01/11/2016. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LESA, LLC v. Family Trust of Kimberley and Alfred Mandel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LESA, LLC
Represented By: Jack Russo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Trust of Kimberley and Alfred Mandel
Represented By: Thomas Edward Moore, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Taylor
Represented By: Thomas Edward Moore, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Fisher
Represented By: Thomas Edward Moore, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Williams
Represented By: Thomas Edward Moore, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2000 Jackson Family Trust
Represented By: Thomas Edward Moore, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?