USAA Life Insurance Company v. Romonek et al

Plaintiff: USAA Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Rebecca L. Romonek, Matthew Lev, Kristina Goth, The Lev Trust and Estate of James B. Lev
Case Number: 3:2015cv05582
Filed: December 7, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 22, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 43 STIPULATION DIRECTING DISTRIBUTION OF LIFE INSURANCE PROCEEDS AND FOR DISMISSAL OF CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2016)
March 9, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE 30 MOTION TO DISCHARGE PLAINTIFF AND STAKEHOLDER USAA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY IN INTERPLEADER ACTION AND ORDER RE ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2016)
January 11, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 24 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/26/15. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USAA Life Insurance Company v. Romonek et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USAA Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Gabrielle Ana Hollingsworth
Represented By: Joshua Nathan Kastan
Represented By: Robert Stewart McLay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca L. Romonek
Represented By: Edward Rheem Fluet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Lev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristina Goth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Lev Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of James B. Lev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?