Wiley et al v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Peter Wiley and Calliope Ladas
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc., MTC Financial and JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2015cv05584
Filed: December 7, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 6, 2017 82 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 6, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2017)
February 27, 2017 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING IN PART AND GRANTING IN PART CALIBERS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting in part and denying in part 55 Motion for Summary Judgment. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2017)
December 7, 2016 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 47 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2016)
May 16, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER NOTING DISMISSAL re 45 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Miguel De Sanz. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 16, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2016)
March 18, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER NOTING DISMISSAL re 34 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO DISMISS DEFENDANTS filed by Peter Wiley, Calliope Ladas. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 18, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2016)
March 16, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Deadline to add parties or amend the pleadings 4/1/2016. Mediation deadline 5/24/2016. Fact discovery cut-off 9/30/2016. Expert disclosures 10/21/2016. Expert rebuttal 11/4/2016. Expert discovery cut-off 12/16/2016. Deadli ne to file dispositive motions 12/16/2016. Pretrial conference statement due 2/28/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/10/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. Jury Trial set for 4/3/2017-4/6/2017 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 16, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wiley et al v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Wiley
Represented By: Richard Philip Sax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calliope Ladas
Represented By: Richard Philip Sax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Kristine Elizabeth Kruger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTC Financial
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Joseph Edward Addiego, III
Represented By: Sanjay Mohan Nangia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?