Odinma v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Carol Odinma
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. and ChexSystems
Case Number: 3:2015cv05592
Filed: December 8, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 16, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re 38 Stipulation filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., ChexSystems, Carol Odinma, ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/16/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2016)
May 11, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING DATES AND SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING. Compliance hearing is set for Friday, 6/24/2016 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/11/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2016)
May 10, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: SEALED TRANSCRIPT AND FTR AUDIO RECORDING in relation to 34 Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/10/16. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2016)
January 27, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/1/2016 is CONTINUED to Monday, 2/29/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/27/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Odinma v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Odinma
Represented By: Kelechi Charles Emeziem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ChexSystems
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Topor
Represented By: Jennifer Lawdan Yazdi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?