Cobbler Nevada, LLC v. DOE-24.7.40.252

Plaintiff: Cobbler Nevada, LLC
Defendant: DOE-24.7.40.252
Case Number: 3:2015cv05614
Filed: December 9, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 10, 2017 46 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/10/2017. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2017)
December 21, 2015 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Early Discovery 5 by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2015)
December 18, 2015 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER relating this case to Cobbler Nevada, LLC v. Doe-73.15.228.64(case 15-cv-5513 EDL) by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cobbler Nevada, LLC v. DOE-24.7.40.252
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cobbler Nevada, LLC
Represented By: James Stephen Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE-24.7.40.252
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?