Alvernaz et al v. A1 Solar Power, Inc.

Plaintiff: Rodrigo Alvernaz and Mary Jean Alvernaz
Defendant: A1 Solar Power, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv05641
Filed: December 10, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 11, 2017 57 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL SIXTY DAY ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/11/17. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2017)
July 20, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 38 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by A1 Solar Power, Inc. Linda Lucero substitutes in as counsel of record for A1 Solar. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/20/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2016)
July 5, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 34 Requests to Appear by telephone at Case Management Conference filed by Mary Jean Alvernaz, Rodrigo Alvernaz. The Court will contact counsel at 925-516-4686. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/5/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2016)
June 8, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 7/8/2016 02:00 PM.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/8/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2016)
May 27, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 29 Letter filed by Mary Jean Alvernaz, Rodrigo Alvernaz for Jim Price, counsel for Plaintiff, to appear by phone on 6/3/16.. Signed, as modified, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/27/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2016)
March 4, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 19 Notice (Other) for Telephonic Appearance filed by A1 Solar Power, Inc. Signed, as modified, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/4/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
January 21, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 9 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by A1 Solar Power, Inc. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/21/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alvernaz et al v. A1 Solar Power, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodrigo Alvernaz
Represented By: Jim Gerhart Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Jean Alvernaz
Represented By: Jim Gerhart Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A1 Solar Power, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?