Heras et al v. Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Herlinda Heras
Defendant: Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Anthem UM Services, Inc., Commonwealth Holding-Turfway, Inc. and Commonwealth Hotels, Inc. Welfare Plan
Case Number: 3:2015cv05722
Filed: December 14, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 28:1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 26, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/26/2016. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2016)
March 8, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE STIPULATION CONCERNING SERVICE OF PROCESS AND SCHEDULING by Hon. William Alsup granting 22 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2016)
January 22, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Statement due by 3/17/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/24/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/22/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2016)
January 11, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 15 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/26/15. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2016)
January 7, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AS MOOT by Hon. William Alsup finding as moot 8 Motion to Dismiss.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2016)
January 5, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court REQUEST FOR RESPONSE re 8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Anthem UM Services, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc. Responses due by 1/7/2016.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/5/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heras et al v. Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herlinda Heras
Represented By: W. Christian Krankemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc.
Represented By: Karen A. Braje
Represented By: Kurt Charles Peterson
Represented By: Kenneth Neil Smersfelt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem UM Services, Inc.
Represented By: Karen A. Braje
Represented By: Kurt Charles Peterson
Represented By: Kenneth Neil Smersfelt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Holding-Turfway, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Hotels, Inc. Welfare Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?