Safari Kid Inc. et al v. Irani et al

Plaintiff: Safari Kid Inc. and Safari Kid Franchising LLC
Defendant: Mahzad Irani, Feradoon Irani and Ness Enterprise LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv05731
Filed: December 14, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL; ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE.The 9/30/2016 Compliance hearing is VACATED. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/29/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2016)
April 21, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/21/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2016)
April 6, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on April 6, 2016. (ygrlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Safari Kid Inc. et al v. Irani et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Safari Kid Inc.
Represented By: Padmini Cheruvu
Represented By: Eric Andrew Handler
Represented By: Dawn Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Safari Kid Franchising LLC
Represented By: Padmini Cheruvu
Represented By: Eric Andrew Handler
Represented By: Dawn Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mahzad Irani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Feradoon Irani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ness Enterprise LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?