The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company v. N.W. et al

Plaintiff: The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Defendant: N. W. and Tanya Morris-Harvey
Case Number: 3:2015cv05763
Filed: December 16, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 2, 2017 63 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 62 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL filed by N. W.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/2/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2017)
November 21, 2016 59 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 58 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Distribution of Funds and Dismissal filed by N. W. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/21/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2016)
May 24, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 45 Defendant's Letter of May 13, 2016. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/24/2016. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2016)
May 13, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 43 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by N. W. AMENDED filed by N. W. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on May 13, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 4, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND AMENDED ORDER re 40 FOR DISMISSAL (without prejudice) OF LINCOLN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY AND FOR PARTIAL DISTRIBUTION OF INTERPLEADED FUNDS filed by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/4/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2016)
May 2, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 38 For Dismissal of the Lincoln National Life Insurance Company and for Partial Distribution of Interpleaded Funds filed by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/2/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2016)
March 8, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. Case Management Statement due by 4/7/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/14/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/8/2016. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2016)
February 29, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR, STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/29/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company v. N.W. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Megan Lynn Barker
Represented By: Douglas Scullion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. W.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanya Morris-Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?