Ghalehtak et al v. FNBN I, LLC

Plaintiff: Farid Ghalehtak and Shirin Tabatabai
Defendant: FNBN I, LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv05821
Filed: December 18, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 29, 2016 45 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler denying 44 Motion to Vacate. The court denies the plaintiffs' motion to vacate the judgment for the reasons stated in the attached order. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2016)
June 28, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Opposition/Non-Opposition due by 6/29/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 6/28/2016. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2016)
May 6, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 20 Motion to Dismiss. The court grants the defendant's motion to dismiss and dismisses the TILA claims with prejudice. To the extent the plaintiffs raise state claims to quiet title or for ot her relief, the court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over them. The dismissal is without prejudice to the plaintiffs pursuing state-law claims in state court. The plaintiffs may amend their complaint to assert any other claims arising out of the subject transaction and events within 21 days of this order. If they do not do so, the court will close the case. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ghalehtak et al v. FNBN I, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farid Ghalehtak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirin Tabatabai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNBN I, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?