Thissel et al v. Murphy et al
Plaintiff: Jihan Shawar Thissel, Tony Lee Matthews, Jr., Sidney Thissel and Jamie Fraiser
Defendant: Cameron Murphy, City of Salinas Police Department, City of Salinas, Kelly McMillin, Mark Lazzarini, Jeff Arensdorf and William Yetter
Case Number: 3:2015cv05937
Filed: December 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 152 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/1/19. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 150 STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 5/23/2019 at 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 5/16/2019. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/29/19. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 85 MOTION TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFFS FROM INTRODUCING EVIDENCE OF DAMAGES AND TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE DISCLOSED AFTER NON-EXPERT DISCOVERY CUT-OFF. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2017)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION AND ORDER 57 EXTENDING THE DEADLINE FOR PARTIES TO PARTICIPATE IN EARLY NEUTRAL EVALUATION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/8/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2016)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte granting in part and denying in part 19 Motion to Dismiss. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2016)
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER re 27 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/8/2016. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thissel et al v. Murphy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jihan Shawar Thissel
Represented By: Wendy H Chau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Lee Matthews, Jr.
Represented By: Wendy H Chau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sidney Thissel
Represented By: Wendy H Chau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Fraiser
Represented By: Wendy H Chau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Salinas Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Salinas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly McMillin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Lazzarini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Arensdorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Yetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?