Abante Rooter and Plumbing, Inc. et al v. Alarm.com Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Abante Rooter and Plumbing, Inc., George Ross Manesiotis, Mark Hankins and Philip J. Charvat
Defendant: Alarm.com Incorporated and Alarm.com Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv06314
Filed: December 30, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 313 FINAL APPROVAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT. Motions at Dkt. nos. 295 and 303 are GRANTED, the Class is certified, the Settlement Agreement is finally approved, Class Counsel are awarded $7,000,000 in fees and $529,313.20 in costs, and Service Awards are approved in the amount of $10,000 for each Plaintiff ($30,000 total). Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/15/2019. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER DENYING CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY, AND ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers; denying 195 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 198 Motion to Exclude Expe rt Testimony; denying 205 Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 194 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 204 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 219 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ygrlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2018)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 215 Motion to Stay. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2018)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER SETTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT PRE-FILING CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, re 181 Letter filed by Philip J. Charvat, Abante Rooter and Plumbing, Inc., Mark Hankins, 180 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Philip J. Charvat, Abante Rooter and Plumbing, Inc., Mark Hankins, 179 Letter filed by Alarm.com Holdings, Inc., Alarm.com Incorporated Court sets a summary judgment pre-filing conference for Friday, 4/6/18 at 2:00 PM. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for Friday, 4/6/2018 02:01 PM. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/26/18. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2018)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 164 Plaintiffs' Motion To Amend Class Definitions. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2018)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 139 Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend the Class Definitions. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2017)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 133 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/2/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 84 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 85 Motion to Certify Class; granting 92 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 98 Motion to Strike ; denying 100 Motio n to Strike ; denying 102 Motion to Strike ; granting 115 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. The Court appoints plaintiffs' counsel as class counsel. Case Management Statement due by 5/22/2017. Case Management Conference specially set for Tuesday, 5/30/2017 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. CMC Statement by 5/22/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2017)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MDL ORDER DENYING TRANSFER by MDL Panel (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2016)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/11/2016. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2016)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/16/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2016)
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING re 20 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Alarm.com Holdings, Inc., Alarm.com Incorporated. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/9/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abante Rooter and Plumbing, Inc. et al v. Alarm.com Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abante Rooter and Plumbing, Inc.
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Represented By: Edward A. Broderick
Represented By: Kerem M. Levitas
Represented By: Jonathan Rehe Marshall
Represented By: Matthew P. McCue
Represented By: Jennifer Rust Murray
Represented By: Anthony I. Paronich
Represented By: Michael Francis Ram
Represented By: Beth E. Terrell
Represented By: Marc R. Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Ross Manesiotis
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Represented By: Edward A. Broderick
Represented By: Kerem M. Levitas
Represented By: Jonathan Rehe Marshall
Represented By: Matthew P. McCue
Represented By: Jennifer Rust Murray
Represented By: Anthony I. Paronich
Represented By: Michael Francis Ram
Represented By: Beth E. Terrell
Represented By: Marc R. Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Hankins
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Represented By: Edward A. Broderick
Represented By: Kerem M. Levitas
Represented By: Jonathan Rehe Marshall
Represented By: Matthew P. McCue
Represented By: Jennifer Rust Murray
Represented By: Anthony I. Paronich
Represented By: Michael Francis Ram
Represented By: Beth E. Terrell
Represented By: Marc R. Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip J. Charvat
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Represented By: Edward A. Broderick
Represented By: Kerem M. Levitas
Represented By: Jonathan Rehe Marshall
Represented By: Matthew P. McCue
Represented By: Jennifer Rust Murray
Represented By: Anthony I. Paronich
Represented By: Michael Francis Ram
Represented By: Beth E. Terrell
Represented By: Marc R. Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alarm.com Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alarm.com Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?