Darrow Family Partners v. Everett et al

Appellant: Darrow Family Partners
Appellee: Kyle Everett
Trustee: Office of the U.S. Trustee/Oak, and Tracy Hope Davis
Miscellaneous: Buchalter Nemer
Case Number: 3:2015cv06324
Filed: December 30, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 8, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFFIRMING JUDGMENT OF BANKRUPTCY COURT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 8, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2016)
September 9, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING APPELLANT TO PROVIDE CHAMBERS COPY OF OPENING BRIEF AND OF EACH DOCUMENT FILED IN BANKRUPTCY COURT CITED IN OPENING BRIEF. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 9, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2016)
July 28, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR APPELLEE TO RESPOND TO APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. Appellee is directed to file, no later than Friday, July 29, 2016, at 4:00 p.m., any opposition to appellant's application for an extension.Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 28, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Darrow Family Partners v. Everett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Darrow Family Partners
Represented By: Paul Gilruth McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Kyle Everett
Represented By: Craig C. Chiang
Represented By: Robert E. Izmirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Office of the U.S. Trustee/Oak,
Represented By: Lynette Carol Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Tracy Hope Davis
Represented By: Lynette Carol Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Buchalter Nemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?