Isensee v. KaloBios Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Austin Isensee
Defendant: Martin Shkreli and Chris Thorn
Case Number: 3:2015cv06331
Filed: December 31, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 29, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference scheduled for April 28, 2016, in Isensee v. KaloBios Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Case No. 5:15-cv-06331-EJD, is VACATED. The Case Management Conference in the above-entitled a ction (5:15-cv-05841-EJD) is CONTINUED from April 28, 2016, to 9:00 a.m. June 2, 2016. The parties shall file an updated Joint Case Management Conference Statement on or before May 26, 2016. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/28/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2016)
April 28, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONSOLIDATING C15-5992 and C15-6331 RELATED ACTIONS, APPOINTING LEAD PLAINTIFF, AND APPROVING SELECTION OF COUNSEL The Master File shall be No. 15-cv-05841-EJD. All orders, pleadings, motions and other documents shall, when filed and docketed in the Master File. The Clerk shall administratively close Case Nos. 5:15-cv-05992-EJD and 5:15-cv-06331-EJD. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/28/16. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2016)
February 16, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court REFERRAL FOR PURPOSE OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP. The above-entitled case is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable Edward J. Davila for consideration of whether the case is related to 15-5841 EJD Li v. KaloBios Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/16/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Isensee v. KaloBios Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Austin Isensee
Represented By: Patrick V. Dahlstrom
Represented By: Marc Gorrie
Represented By: J Alexander Hood
Represented By: J. Alexander Hood, II
Represented By: Jeremy A Lieberman
Represented By: Jeremy A. Lieberman
Represented By: Jennifer Pafiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Shkreli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Thorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?