Joseph Ercoli v. JLC Productions et al

Plaintiff: Joseph Ercoli
Defendant: JLC Productions, Top Shelf Classics, InterContinental Hotels Group PLC and Kimpton Hotel & Restaurant
Case Number: 3:2015cv06333
Filed: December 31, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/8/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2016)
August 5, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for additional briefing. The court requests additional information regarding the plaintiff's default-judgment motion and directs that it be submitted by August 10, 2016 at 12:00 p.m. The matter remains on calendar for August 11 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 8/5/2016. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2016)
July 19, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER as to [30 Letter, 26 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendant Top Shelf Classic: Motion Hearing reset for 8/11/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 7/19/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2016)
June 15, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING; VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Compliance Hearing set for Friday, 7/8/2016 09:01 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/15/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2016)
May 9, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating the Friday, 5/13/2016 at 9:01AM Compliance hearing. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/9/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2016)
May 3, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS re 19 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Joseph Ercoli, InterContinental Hotels Group PLC (a foreign corporation) and Kimpton Hotel & Restaurant terminated.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/3/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2016)
April 7, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/11/2016 is CONTINUED to Monday, 6/20/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. Compliance Hearing regarding service is set for Friday, 5/13/2016 09:01 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/7/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2016)
March 29, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 13 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant JLC Productions filed by Joseph Ercoli. JLC Productions (a California corporation) terminated. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/29/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2016)
February 3, 2016 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/3/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joseph Ercoli v. JLC Productions et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Ercoli
Represented By: Andrew D. Winghart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JLC Productions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Top Shelf Classics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: InterContinental Hotels Group PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimpton Hotel & Restaurant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?