In re: Application of Medical Research Council for Order

Movant: Medical Research Council
Objector: Genentech, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015mc80213
Filed: August 7, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 6, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED 44 ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF IN RE: APPLICATION OF MEDICAL RESEARCH COUNCIL FOR ORDER. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 4/6/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2016)
April 5, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 43 Stipulation for Dismissal of In re: Application of Medical Research Council for Order (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2016)
March 10, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER REGARDING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 3/10/2016. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2016)
March 7, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court FURTHER ORDER REGARDING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 3/7/2016. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2016)
March 1, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 37 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Paul B. Gaffney.(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2016)
February 19, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 35 MOTION for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration. Motion Hearing set for 3/2/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 2/19/2016. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2016)
February 2, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. REFFERRING DISCOVERY MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DENYING 27 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2016)
January 13, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART APPLICANTS 28 MOTION TO SEAL.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2016)
December 16, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Discovery Dispute. Signed by Judge Sallie Kim on December 16, 2015. (sklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2015)
September 10, 2015 20 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 1 Application For an Ex Parte Order to Take Discovery From Genentech For Use in a Foreign Proceeding re 19 Amended Proposed Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 9/10/2015. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2015)
August 17, 2015 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE Re: 1 Ex Parte Application. Responses due by 8/24/2015 by 10:00 a.m. Motion Hearing set for 8/26/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 8/17/2015. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Application of Medical Research Council for Order
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Medical Research Council
Represented By: David Shane Brun
Represented By: Shane Brun
Represented By: Claire Christine Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Objector: Genentech, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Faucette
Represented By: Aaron P Maurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?