In the Matter of a Deposition Subpoena Sreved in RxD Media, LLC v. IP Application Development LLC

Plaintiff: RxD Media, LLC
Defendant: IP Application Development LLC
Case Number: 3:2015mc80291
Filed: November 27, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 4, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING 13 MOTION TO SEAL. Show Cause Response due by 1/8/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 1/4/2016. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2016)
December 4, 2015 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re 1 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Apple Inc. Responses due by 12/16/2015. Replies due by 12/23/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 12/4/2015. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2015)
November 30, 2015 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 11/30/2015. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In the Matter of a Deposition Subpoena Sreved in RxD Media, LLC v. IP Application Development LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RxD Media, LLC
Represented By: Andrew S. Dallmann
Represented By: Cecil E. Key
Represented By: Sara Sakagami
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IP Application Development LLC
Represented By: Claudia Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?