Anderson et al v. McCarthy et al

Plaintiff: Jeff Anderson, Bret Adee, David Hackenberg, Pollinator Stewardship Council, Lucas Criswell, Gail Fuller, American Bird Conservancy, Center for Food Safety and Pesticide Action Network North America
Defendant: Gina McCarthy and Environmental Protection Agency
Case Number: 3:2016cv00068
Filed: January 6, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05:0701
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 21, 2016 111 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/21/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2016)
October 12, 2016 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING STIPULATED REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE 102 by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2016)
September 7, 2016 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) REQUIRING IN CAMERA REVIEW OF DOCUMENTS; AND (2) DENYING LEAVE TO CONDUCT LIMITED DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/7/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2016)
August 29, 2016 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING REQUEST FOR EXTENSION. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/29/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2016)
July 14, 2016 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION 66 .(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2016)
June 20, 2016 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 71 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINES.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2016)
May 13, 2016 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE 26 MOTION TO INTERVENE AND 20 MOTION TO DISMISS. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
April 28, 2016 60 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/28/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2016)
April 5, 2016 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART 48 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINE.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2016)
March 23, 2016 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 43 MOTION FOR PR HAC VICE.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2016)
March 21, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER MOVING HEARING ON MOTION TO INTERVENE, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 26 MOTION to Intervene . Motion Hearing set for 5/12/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/21/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2016)
March 11, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 23 STIPULATION to Adjust Briefing Schedule.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2016) Modified on 3/11/2016 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 18 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/11/16. (dlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson et al v. McCarthy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Anderson
Represented By: Peter Jenkins
Represented By: Adam Keats
Represented By: Amy L. van Saun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bret Adee
Represented By: Peter Jenkins
Represented By: Adam Keats
Represented By: Amy L. van Saun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Hackenberg
Represented By: Peter Jenkins
Represented By: Adam Keats
Represented By: Amy L. van Saun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pollinator Stewardship Council
Represented By: Peter Jenkins
Represented By: Adam Keats
Represented By: Amy L. van Saun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucas Criswell
Represented By: Peter Jenkins
Represented By: Adam Keats
Represented By: Amy L. van Saun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Fuller
Represented By: Peter Jenkins
Represented By: Adam Keats
Represented By: Amy L. van Saun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Bird Conservancy
Represented By: Peter Jenkins
Represented By: Adam Keats
Represented By: Amy L. van Saun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Food Safety
Represented By: Peter Jenkins
Represented By: Adam Keats
Represented By: Amy L. van Saun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pesticide Action Network North America
Represented By: Peter Jenkins
Represented By: Adam Keats
Represented By: Amy L. van Saun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Environmental Protection Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?