John Solari et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: John Solari and Diane Solari
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder & Weiss, LLP
Case Number: 3:2016cv00074
Filed: January 6, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 15, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.'S REQUEST MADE IN REPORT ON STATUS OF SETTLEMENT re 22 Proposed Order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/15/16. Notice of voluntary dismissal or stipulation for dismissal due by 3/24/16. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2016)
January 26, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT: Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/1/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/8/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/26/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2016)
January 12, 2016 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Referring Case to ADR Unit for Assessment Telephone Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 01/12/2016. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John Solari et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Solari
Represented By: Marc Steven Applbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Solari
Represented By: Marc Steven Applbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Robert Arthur Bailey
Represented By: Steven Robert Telles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder & Weiss, LLP
Represented By: James T. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?