VonHofen v. City of Albany et al

Plaintiff: Amber VonHofen
Defendant: City of Albany, City of Walnut Creek, Peter O'Conner, Amy Ballock, Mike McQuiston and Daniel Adams
Case Number: 3:2016cv00075
Filed: January 6, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 17, 2017 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Order vacating initial case management conference. Show Cause Response due by 1/31/2017. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/17/2017. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
August 25, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 11 Stipulation to continue Initial Case Management Conference. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2016)
March 8, 2016 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 6 Motion to Continue Case Management Conference a d ADR Deadlines.(rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VonHofen v. City of Albany et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Albany
Represented By: Ann M. Asiano
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Brand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Walnut Creek
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Brand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter O'Conner
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Brand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Ballock
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Brand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike McQuiston
Represented By: Ann M. Asiano
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Brand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Adams
Represented By: Ann M. Asiano
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Brand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber VonHofen
Represented By: Richard Allen Madsen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?