Marlowe v. City and County of San Francisco et al

Plaintiff: Heather Marlowe
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco, Suzy Loftus, Greg Surh, Mikail Ali and Joe Cordes
Case Number: 3:2016cv00076
Filed: January 6, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 10, 2017 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 10, 2017. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2017)
December 21, 2016 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Plaintiff's new deadline to respond to defendants' motion to dismiss is December 22, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 12/21/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2016)
September 27, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS; AFFORDING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO AMEND; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The First Amended Complaint is dismissed. Marlowe is afforded leave to file, no later than October 21, 2016, a Second Amended Complai nt. The Case Management Conference is continued from October 28, 2016, to January 20, 2017, at 10:30 a.m.; a Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than January 13, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 27, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2016)
August 16, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 16, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2016)
August 2, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 2, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marlowe v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Marlowe
Represented By: Alexander Solomon Zalkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzy Loftus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Surh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mikail Ali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Cordes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?