Metheny v. JL Beverage Company LLC

Appellant: John Steven Metheny
Appellee: JL Beverage Company LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv00077
Filed: January 7, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 21, 2017 14 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 2/21/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2017)
February 17, 2017 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFFIRMING ORDER & JUDGMENT OF BANKRUPTCY COURT. ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 2/17/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2017)
February 1, 2017 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO PRO TEM REPORTER TO PRODUCE TRANSCRIPT. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 2/1/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metheny v. JL Beverage Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: John Steven Metheny
Represented By: Matthew Dake Metzger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: JL Beverage Company LLC
Represented By: George Leo Hampton, IV
Represented By: Colin Christopher Holley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?