McKesson Corporation v. New Iberia Rx Inc et al

Plaintiff: McKesson Corporation
Defendant: New Iberia Rx Inc, Zachary Rx Inc and Raphael Meche
Case Number: 3:2016cv00105
Filed: January 7, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 16, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Submit Supplemental Briefing In Support of 24 Amended MOTION for Default Judgment by the Clerk as to Defendants New Iberia Rx, Inc. Dba Delaunes Pharmacy And Home Medical, Zachary Rx, Inc. Dba Carerx Express And Raphael Meche; filed by McKesson Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 06/16/2016. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2016)
June 10, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Submit Supplemental Briefing in Support of 24 Amended MOTION for Default Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 06/10/2016. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2016)
May 26, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Submit Further Supplemental Briefing in Support of Motion for Default Judgment 16 . Plaintiff shall file its additional briefing by June 2, 2016. Any opposition or statement of non-opposition is due no later than June 8, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 05/26/2016. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2016)
May 12, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Submit Supplemental Briefing re 16 MOTION for Default Judgment by May 23, 2016. Any Opposition or statement of non-opposition is due by May 31, 2016. Motion Hearing set for 6/30/2016 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/12/2016. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2016)
March 31, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating Initial Case Management Conference and Denying as Moot 12 Plaintiff's Motion for Telephonic Appearance. Plaintiff to file a Motion for Default Judgment or Status Report due by 5/2/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 3/31/16. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKesson Corporation v. New Iberia Rx Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Mancy Ancy Pendergrass
Represented By: Scott Ormond Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Iberia Rx Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary Rx Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raphael Meche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?