Navigant Consulting, Inc. v. Navigant Solutions, LLC et.al.

Plaintiff: Navigant Consulting, Inc.
Defendant: Navigant Solutions, LLC and Hadi Yashruti
Case Number: 3:2016cv00126
Filed: January 8, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 13, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 45 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO DISMISS filed by Navigant Consulting, Inc., ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 7/13/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2016)
May 31, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASES. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/27/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/3/2016 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 5/31/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2016)
May 27, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on May 27, 2016. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2016)
May 3, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on May 3, 2016. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2016)
April 29, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on April 29, 2016. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2016)
April 28, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to file Joint Case Management Statement. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on April 28, 2016. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Navigant Consulting, Inc. v. Navigant Solutions, LLC et.al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Navigant Consulting, Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie Powers Skaff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navigant Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hadi Yashruti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?