United States of America v. $50,000 in United States Currency

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $50,000 in United States Currency
Case Number: 3:2016cv00132
Filed: January 8, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 31, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING GOVERNMENT TO SERVE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/31/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2016)
April 7, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE. Status Report due by 5/27/2016. Status Conference set for 6/3/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/7/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2016)
April 5, 2016 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. Show Cause Response due by 3:00 p.m. on 4/7/2016. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/5/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $50,000 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Patricia Jean Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $50,000 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?