Robern, Inc. v. Shine Bathrooms, Inc.

Plaintiff: Robern, Inc.
Defendant: Shine Bathrooms, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00133
Filed: January 8, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 14, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STRIKING ANSWER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/14/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2016)
July 19, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CONTINUE SETTELEMENT CONFERENCE 36 . The Settlement Conference set for July 26, 2016 is vacated. Parties to contact the Courtroom Deputy to reschedule after pending motions are resolved. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 7/19/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2016)
February 25, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/25/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robern, Inc. v. Shine Bathrooms, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robern, Inc.
Represented By: Kadie M. Jelenchick
Represented By: Eileen Regina Ridley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shine Bathrooms, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?