Bosley v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Robert Bosley
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2016cv00139
Filed: January 10, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 25, 2017 93 Opinion or Order of the Court WRIT of Of Execution issued in the amount of $128,530.46 (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
September 14, 2017 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 77 MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2017)
August 1, 2017 81 Opinion or Order of the Court WRIT of Execution issued in the amount of $77,432.98 (msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2017)
June 13, 2017 69 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/13/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2017)
January 24, 2017 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/24/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/22/2017 03:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2017)
January 11, 2017 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING DEADLINE RE INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXPERT (pursuant to 55 stipulation) by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2017)
December 9, 2016 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 39 PLAINTIFF'S RENEWED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/9/2016. Bench Trial set for 3/15/2017 07:30 AM before Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2016)
November 30, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE QUESTIONS FOR HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S RENEWED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/30/2016. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2016)
November 17, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING HEARING AND RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/17/2016. Motion Hearing set for 12/1/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/1/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2016)
July 6, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO CONTINUE DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY TO FILE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Hon. William Alsup granting 29 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2016)
June 28, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/28/2016. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2016)
April 11, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge William H. Alsup on 3/17/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bosley v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Bosley
Represented By: Scott D. Kalkin, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?