Robb v. Fitbit Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Brian H. Robb
Defendant: Fitbit Inc., James Park and William R. Zerella
Case Number: 3:2016cv00151
Filed: January 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER FOR CLASS COUNSEL TO FILE POST-DISTRIBUTION ACCOUNTING (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR DISTRIBUTION OF CLASS SETTLEMENT FUNDS (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/3/2019)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER OF ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/22/2019)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR PARTIAL RECONSIDERATION 137 143 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/19/2017)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER GRANTING FITBIT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR PARTIAL RECONSIDERATION (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/21/2016)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS 107 110 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/26/2016)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER, Motions terminated: 75 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by James Park, William R. Zerella, Fitbit Inc.. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/14/2016 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/25/16. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2016)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER RE: APPOINTMENT OF LEAD PLAINTIFF AND LEAD COUNSEL 11 14 22 26 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/10/2016)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATIONS (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/15/2016)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER, Motions terminated: 56 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING APRIL 15, 2016 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Brian H. Robb. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/10/2016 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 4/13/16. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robb v. Fitbit Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian H. Robb
Represented By: Patrick V. Dahlstrom
Represented By: Marc Gorrie
Represented By: J Alexander Hood
Represented By: Jeremy A Lieberman
Represented By: Jennifer Pafiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fitbit Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William R. Zerella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?