Sadeghi et al v. Aramark Refreshment Services, LLC

Plaintiff: Masih Sadeghi, Abdul Benjamin, Monica Jones and Brandi Crawford
Defendant: Aramark Refreshment Services, LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv00176
Filed: January 11, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 19, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 24 Stipulation filed by Monica Jones, Brandi Crawford, Abdul Benjamin, Masih Sadeghi. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/19/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2016)
April 12, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR. STIPULATION AND ORDER re 18 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Aramark Refreshment Services, LLC filed by Aramark Refreshment Services, LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/12/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2016)
March 7, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 14 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Initial Case Management Conference of April 14, 2016 filed by Aramark Refreshment Services, LLC. Case Management Statement due by 4/14/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/21/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/7/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2016)
January 13, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Edward M. Chen. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/13/16. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sadeghi et al v. Aramark Refreshment Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aramark Refreshment Services, LLC
Represented By: Lyndsey Marie Marcelino
Represented By: Melinda S. Riechert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Masih Sadeghi
Represented By: Na'il Benjamin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdul Benjamin
Represented By: Na'il Benjamin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Jones
Represented By: Na'il Benjamin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandi Crawford
Represented By: Na'il Benjamin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?