Instagram LLC v. Zhou et al

Plaintiff: Instagram, LLC
Defendant: Murong Zhou, Guihe He, Mufen Zhou and Meifang Zhou
Case Number: 3:2016cv00235
Filed: January 13, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 23, 2017 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 30 Motion to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2017)
April 21, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF REFERENCE ANDORDER ON DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/21/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2016)
April 13, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S 15 MOTION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; DIRECTING STATUS REPORT. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Instagram LLC v. Zhou et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murong Zhou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guihe He
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mufen Zhou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meifang Zhou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Instagram, LLC
Represented By: Ryan T. Bricker
Represented By: James G. Gilliland
Represented By: Larry Wayne McFarland
Represented By: Christopher Theodore Varas
Represented By: Kollin J Zimmermann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?