Gregory Noto v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Gregory Noto
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00273
Filed: January 15, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2016 45 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND RESETTING CMC re 43 filed by Caliber Home Loans, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 3/16/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/23/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/6/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2016)
July 26, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER. Case Management Statement due by 9/29/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/6/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/26/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2016)
June 29, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 26 Continuing CMC and Associated Deadlines and Extending Deadline for Caliber to Respond to Complaint filed by Caliber Home Loans, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 8/25/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/8/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/29/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2016)
June 6, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing CMC and Associated Deadlines and Extending Deadline for Caliber to Respond to Complaint filed by Caliber Home Loans, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 7/27/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/4/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/6/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2016)
May 3, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 21 Continuing CMC and Associated Deadlines and Extending Deadline for Caliber to Respond to Complaint filed by Caliber Home Loans, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 6/23/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/30/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/3/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2016)
March 28, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing CMC and Associated Deadlines filed by Caliber Home Loans, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 6/2/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/9/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/28/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gregory Noto v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Noto
Represented By: Michael James Yesk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Russ M. Fukano
Represented By: Kenneth James MacArthur
Represented By: AnnMarie Mori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?