Go Green Synthetic Lawn Solutions, LLC v. Go Green Synthetic Grass, LLC

Plaintiff: Go Green Synthetic Lawn Solutions, LLC
Defendant: Go Green Synthetic Grass, LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv00291
Filed: January 19, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 20, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE DISMISSAL filed by Go Green Synthetic Lawn Solutions, LLC, Motions terminated: 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Go Green Synthetic Grass, LLC. Copy mailed to Defendant. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/20/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2016)
May 12, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Discharging 11 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/12/2016. (emclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2016)
April 22, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 5/2/2016. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/22/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Go Green Synthetic Lawn Solutions, LLC v. Go Green Synthetic Grass, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Go Green Synthetic Lawn Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Kathleen E. Finnerty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Go Green Synthetic Grass, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?