Bruce Alan Walker v. Marion Spearman

Defendant: Marion Spearman
Petitioner: Bruce Alan Walker
Case Number: 3:2016cv00294
Filed: January 19, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 11, 2016 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on May 11, 2016. (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2016)
May 10, 2016 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER LIFTING STAY by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting 8 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2016)
January 20, 2016 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER HOLDING PROCEEDINGS IN ABEYANCE. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on January 20, 2016, granting 3 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bruce Alan Walker v. Marion Spearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marion Spearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bruce Alan Walker
Represented By: Marilee Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?