AliphCom, Inc., v. VDNA Trading, LLC

Plaintiff: AliphCom, Inc
Defendant: VDNA Trading, LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv00302
Filed: January 19, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 18, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 28 STIPULATION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference until June 17, 2016. Case Management Statement due by 6/10/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/17/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on March 18, 2016. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2016)
March 14, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 20 STIPULATION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/27/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/3/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/14/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2016)
February 19, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 18 STIPULATION as to 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Responses due by 3/11/2016. Replies due by 3/25/2016. Motion Hearing set for 4/8/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/19/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2016)
February 18, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT: Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/15/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/22/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/18/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AliphCom, Inc., v. VDNA Trading, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AliphCom, Inc
Represented By: James A. Hughes
Represented By: Robert T. Sullwold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VDNA Trading, LLC
Represented By: Charles S. Fax
Represented By: Kristen Law Sagafi
Represented By: Liesel Johanna Schopler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?