IntelePeer Cloud Communications, LLC v. Millicorp, Inc.

Plaintiff: IntelePeer Cloud Communications, LLC
Defendant: Millicorp, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00303
Filed: January 19, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 10, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of IntelePeer Cloud Communications, LLC against Millicorp, Inc. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/9/2016. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2016)
May 9, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge James Donato adopting 14 Report and Recommendations as to 11 Motion for Default Judgment. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2016)
April 4, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE DECLARATION RE: DAMAGES AND INTEREST CALCULATION re 11 MOTION for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/4/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2016)
March 4, 2016 10 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE re: Default Judgment Procedure. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/4/2016. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IntelePeer Cloud Communications, LLC v. Millicorp, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IntelePeer Cloud Communications, LLC
Represented By: Anita Taff-Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millicorp, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?