Koidal v. American Honda Finance Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Steve H. Koidal
Defendant: American Honda Finance Corporation, Travis Credit Union, Wells Fargo Auto Finance, Inc., Dell Financial Services L.L.C., Chase Bank USA, N.A., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax Information Services LLC and Trans Union LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv00350
Filed: January 21, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2016 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 72 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice, Between Plaintiff and Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Only. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2016)
September 6, 2016 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 70 Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Dismissal in Respect to Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2016)
August 26, 2016 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 66 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice, Between Plaintiff and Defendant Travis Credit Union Only. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2016)
May 3, 2016 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 53 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice, Between Plaintiff and Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC Only. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2016)
April 13, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 46 Stipulation Of Dismissal With Prejudice Between Plaintiff And Defendant Trans Union, LLC Only. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2016)
April 4, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION Selecting Mediation. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 4/4/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koidal v. American Honda Finance Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve H. Koidal
Represented By: Clark Ovruchesky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Honda Finance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Auto Finance, Inc.
Represented By: Courtney C Wenrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dell Financial Services L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: Julieta Stepanyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Kelsey Israel-Trummel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Katherine Elisabeth Carlton Robinson
Represented By: Lauren E. Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?