Gary Martinovsky, et al v. County of Alameda et al

Plaintiff: Gary Martinovsky and Integrated Pain Care, Inc.
Defendant: County of Alameda, Eddie Bermudez, Fernando Cubangbang, Nancy E. O'Malley and John Paul Williams
Case Number: 3:2016cv00403
Filed: January 22, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 7, 2017 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING REVISED STIPULATION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINES AND CONTINUE TRIAL DATE. The deadlines in the instant action are continued as follows: (1) the non-expert discovery cutoff is continued to December 18, 2017; (2) the deadline to disclose experts is continued to January 15, 2018; (3) the deadline to disclose rebuttal experts is continued to January 25, 2018; (4) the expert discovery cutoff is continued to February 15, 2018; (5) the last day to file dispositive motions is continued to March 1, 2018; (6) the pretrial conference is continued to May 22, 2018; and (7) the trial date is continued to June 11, 2018. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 07/07/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2017)
March 6, 2017 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 3/6/17. (mmcalc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2017)
January 18, 2017 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Initial Case Management Conference previously scheduled for January 27, 2017, is continued to March 10, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. A Joint Case Management Conference Statement shall be filed no later than March 3, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 1/18/17. (mmcalc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017)
November 29, 2016 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Initial Case Management Conference previously scheduled for December 9, 2016, is hereby continued to January 27, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. A Joint Case Management Conference Statement shall be filed no later than January 20, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/29/16. (mmcalc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2016)
October 21, 2016 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Initial Case Management Conference previously scheduled for October 28, 2016, is hereby continued to December 9, 2016, at 10:30 a.m. A Joint Case Management Conference Statement shall be filed no later than December 2, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/21/16. (mmcalc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2016)
September 20, 2016 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 9/20/16. (mmcalc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2016)
July 29, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE OPPOSITIONS TO MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND TO CONTINUE HEARING; ORDER. (1) Plaintiffs shall file and serve their oppositions to defendants' pending motions to dismiss no later than August 22, 2016, and defend ants shall file and serve their replies by August 29, 2016. (2) The hearing on defendants' motions is continued to September 23, 2016, at 9:00 a.m. (3) The Initial Case Management Conference shall be held October 21, 2016, with the joint case management statement due on October 14, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 29, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2016)
July 6, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED REQUEST TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT; ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION. Defendants will file and serve a response to the First Amended Complaint on or before July 25, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 6, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2016)
May 20, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint shall be filed no later than June 24, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 5/20/16. (mmcalc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2016)
May 5, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPIES OF DOCUMENTS IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 5, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
April 13, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER CHANGING TIME OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER. The Case Management Conference currently set for April 22, 2016, is continued to July 1, 2016, at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 13, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2016)
April 7, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONSTRUING DEFENDANTS' REQUEST AS MOTION TO CHANGE TIME PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 6-3; DENYING REQUEST WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Request is denied, without prejudice to defendants' filing a motion to change time in compliance with the applicable local rules. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 7, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2016)
February 11, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 11, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gary Martinovsky, et al v. County of Alameda et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Martinovsky
Represented By: John Burton
Represented By: Ariana R.M. Gebauer
Represented By: Michael J. Haddad
Represented By: T. Kennedy Helm, IV
Represented By: Julia Sherwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Integrated Pain Care, Inc.
Represented By: John Burton
Represented By: Ariana R.M. Gebauer
Represented By: Michael J. Haddad
Represented By: T. Kennedy Helm, IV
Represented By: Julia Sherwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Alameda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Bermudez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fernando Cubangbang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy E. O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Paul Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?