Covance, Inc. v. InClin, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Covance, Inc.
Defendant: InClin, Inc. and Hope Davies
Case Number: 3:2016cv00429
Filed: January 25, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 28, 2016 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE re 66 Stipulation.The Friday, 1/6/2017 Compliance hearing is VACATED. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/28/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2016)
December 5, 2016 65 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED ORDER [*AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT*] re 63 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by InClin, Inc., Hope Davies, Covance, Inc. Compliance Hearing set for Friday, 12/9/2016 is CONTINUED to Friday, 1/6/2017 09:01 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Filing due 12/30/2016. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/5/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2016)
October 7, 2016 60 Opinion or Order of the Court Discovery Order. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/7/2016. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2016)
September 26, 2016 51 Opinion or Order of the Court Notice of Referral for Discovery. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/26/2016. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2016)
September 21, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 9/30/2016 at 09:01 AM. Show Cause Response due by 9/26/2016. The Case Management Conference currently set for Monday, September 26, 2016 is CONTINUED to Monday, October 3, 2016. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/21/2016. (ygrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2016)
May 13, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/13/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
February 5, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/5/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Covance, Inc. v. InClin, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Covance, Inc.
Represented By: Lee Scott Brenner
Represented By: David E Jang
Represented By: Robert I Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: InClin, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Ross Phillips
Represented By: Sean Matthew Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hope Davies
Represented By: Michael Ross Phillips
Represented By: Sean Matthew Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?