Stavrinides v. Pacific Gas and Electric Company

Plaintiff: Elias Stavrinides
Defendant: Pacific Gas and Electric Company
Case Number: 3:2016cv00433
Filed: January 25, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 8, 2017 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE 46 STIPULATED REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/8/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2017)
July 1, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE OPERATIVE COMPLAINT 39 .(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
June 16, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND by Judge William Alsup [granting in part and denying in part 27 Motion for Leave to File ]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2016)
May 17, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING 29 ORDER DENYING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT. Responses due by 5/31/2016. Motion Hearing set for 6/16/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/17/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2016)
May 16, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 27 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2016)
April 21, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE 8 MOTION TO DISMISS.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2016)
March 21, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE DEFENDANTS REPLY AND HEARING DATE Replies due by 3/30/2016.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/21/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2016)
March 8, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 3/15/2016.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/8/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stavrinides v. Pacific Gas and Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elias Stavrinides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Gas and Electric Company
Represented By: Blaise S. Curet
Represented By: Lindsey Anne Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?