Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) PTE Ltd., v. ASUSTeK Computer Inc et al

Plaintiff: Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) PTE Ltd.,
Defendant: ASUSTeK Computer Inc and ASUS Computer International
Case Number: 3:2016cv00451
Filed: January 26, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 14, 2016 54 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Status Conference. Status Report due by 9/29/2016. Status Conference set for 10/6/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 09/14/2016. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2016)
May 12, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court Notice of Reference and Order re: Discovery Procedures. Discovery Referral 46 . Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/12/2016. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2016)
April 25, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider [Docket No. 181, C-15-4525] (Avago I); and Denying 16 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Avago II). Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2016)
April 15, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. STIPULATION AND ORDER re 32 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) PTE Ltd., filed by Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) PTE Ltd.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/15/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2016)
February 22, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF re: 16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Patent Infringement. Motion Hearing RESET from 4/7/2016 to 4/14/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/22/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) PTE Ltd., v. ASUSTeK Computer Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) PTE Ltd.,
Represented By: Robert John Artuz
Represented By: Matthew C. Holohan
Represented By: Kristopher Lane Reed
Represented By: David E. Sipiora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASUSTeK Computer Inc
Represented By: Michael John Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASUS Computer International
Represented By: Michael John Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?