Restoration Hardware, Inc. et al v. Houzz Inc.

Plaintiff: Restoration Hardware, Inc. and RH USA, LLC
Defendant: Houzz Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00455
Filed: January 26, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 30, 2016 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Court having been advised that the parties have agreed to a settlement of this case, it is ordered that plaintiffs' claims alleged against defendant herein be dismissed without prejudice; provided, however, that i f any party hereto shall certify to this Court, within ninety days, with proof of service of a copy thereof on the opposing party, that the agreed consideration for said settlement has not been delivered, the foregoing Order shall stand vacated and this cause shall forthwith be restored to the calendar for further proceedings as appropriate. Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/30/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2016)
October 28, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST TO EXTEND CERTAIN PRETRIAL DATES. Fact discovery cutoff is 12/16/16. Opening expert reports due 12/31/16. Rebuttal expert reports due 1/27/17. Expert discovery cutoff is 2/13/17. Dispositive motion deadline is 3/10/17. Last date for hearing on any dispositive motion is 4/14/17. Further status conference remains set for 5/5/17. Pretrial conference remains set for 6/6/17. Trial remains set for 7/10/17. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/28/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2016)
September 22, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST TO EXTEND CERTAIN PRETRIAL DATES. Fact discovery cutoff is 12/2/16. Opening expert reports due 12/16/16. Rebuttal expert reports due 1/13/17. Expert discovery cutoff is 2/6/17. Dispositive motion deadline is 3/3/17. Last date for hearing on any dispositive motion is 4/7/17. Further status conference is 5/5/17. Pretrial conference remains set for 6/6/17. Trial remains set for 7/10/17. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 09/22/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2016)
August 17, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 17, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2016)
July 27, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT STIPULATED REQUEST TO EXTEND THE JULY 26, 2016 MEDIATION DEADLINE AND ORDER. The parties' stipulated request to extend the mediation deadline to September 19, 2016 is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 27, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2016)
May 9, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 5/9/16. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2016)
May 5, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPIES OF DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 5, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
April 27, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 27, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Restoration Hardware, Inc. et al v. Houzz Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houzz Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Restoration Hardware, Inc.
Represented By: Anna Theresa Ferrari
Represented By: Sabrina Larson
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RH USA, LLC
Represented By: Anna Theresa Ferrari
Represented By: Sabrina Larson
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?